Pulwers v. Daybreak Solar Power LLC
Plaintiff: Traci Pulwers
Defendant: Daybreak Solar Power LLC a Texas Corporation doing business as Daybreaksolarpower.com
Case Number: 3:2020cv00802
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 8/21/2020 by Traci Pulwers as to Daybreak Solar Power LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Lehrman, Seth)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Daybreak Solar Power LLC. (KEM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-802-J-39JRK. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daybreak Solar Power LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17072491) filed by Traci Pulwers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Lehrman, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulwers v. Daybreak Solar Power LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daybreak Solar Power LLC a Texas Corporation doing business as Daybreaksolarpower.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Pulwers
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?