Dantzler, Inc. v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dantzler, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00838
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by U.S. Security Associates, Inc..(Kloss, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of co-counsel Appearance by Paul K. Silverberg on behalf of Dantzler, Inc. (Silverberg, Paul)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Security Associates, Inc.. (KKH)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-838-J-32PDB. (SJB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17108068) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Daley, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantzler, Inc. v. U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Kloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dantzler, Inc.
Represented By: Damian Daley
Represented By: Paul K. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?