Thomas v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al.
Petitioner: Corey Deshawn Thomas
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2020cv00896
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-896-J- 32MCR. (MAA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00175. File received electronically
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida Jacksonville Division located at US District Court, Office of the Clerk, 300 N Hogan Street, Suite 9-150, Jacksonville FL 32202. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/11/2020. This case is TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to close the file. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Two (2) service copies received, no fee paid, motion for IFP received), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: COREY DESHAWN THOMAS, 127859, MARTINE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1150 SW ALLPATTAH RD, INDIANTOWN, FL 34956. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by COREY DESHAWN THOMAS. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by COREY DESHAWN THOMAS. (Two (2) service copies received, no fee paid, motion for IFP received.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support) (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 8/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Deshawn Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?