D'Amico v. Montoya et al
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Defendant: Lacey Barnett, Vernon Montoya and Unknown Department Staff
Case Number: 3:2020cv00920
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; directing plaintiff to submit three copies of the complaint for service of process by 11/3/2020; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/5/2020. (CAW)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis/AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Steven F. D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Trust Account Statement)(AEJ) Modified event on 9/25/2020. (AEJ)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court by Steven F. D'Amico (AEJ)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Sworn NOTICE to the Court by Steven F. D'Amico (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/10/2020. (KLC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memordandum of Law by Steven F. D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 9/21/2020; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 8/26/2020. (CAW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/18/2020. (CKS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lacey Barnett, Vernon Montoya, Unknown Department Staff with Jury Demand filed by Steven F. D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)(No service copies received, No IFP or payment received. Postmarked 8/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico v. Montoya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?