Tyson v. Leeper
Petitioner: Mark W. Tyson
Respondent: Bill Leeper
Case Number: 3:2020cv00925
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, filed August 26, 2020, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2020. (AEJ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing #1 petition and dismissing case without prejudice, with instructions to the Clerk; denying a certificate of appealability, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/25/2020. (LDO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Affidavit of Indigency by Mark W. Tyson. (KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Mark W. Tyson. (KEM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Mark W. Tyson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Mailing Envelope)(KEM) (No service copies received, no payment received.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark W. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?