Symbology Innovations, LLC v. First Federal Bancorp, Inc.
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Defendant: First Federal Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00928
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to First Federal Bancorp, Inc.. (KKH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-928-J-32PDB. (SJB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Federal Bancorp, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17189837) filed by Symbology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8424752, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations, LLC v. First Federal Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?