Mancuso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Mancuso
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00933
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service as to Commissioner of Social Security executed on 9/2/2020. (BGR)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service as to US Attorney General executed on 9/2/2020. (BGR)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RH)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (BGR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/19/2020. (ADM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-933-J-34MCR. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of John Mancuso (Jacobs, Sarah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Mancuso. (Culbertson, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by John Mancuso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancuso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mancuso
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?