Howard v. St. John's County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Kasim Howard
Defendant: City of St. Augustine Beach, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie, St. John's County Sheriff and Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs
Case Number: 3:2020cv00939
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #31, #32, #33, #34 the motions for leave to amend the complaint. The plaintiff must file the amended complaint by October 19, 2020. Considering the forthcoming amended complaint, the Court denies #9, #11, #14 the motions to dismiss as moot but without prejudice. As instructed, Docs. 24, 30, the caption of an unopposed motion must "include the word 'unopposed,' 'agreed,' or 'stipulated' or otherwise succinctly inform the reader that, as to all or part of the requested relief, no opposition exists," Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/16/2020. (KNR)
October 5, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 34 First MOTION to Amend complaint in Reference to Defendant St. Johns County Sheriff by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text) (BGR).
October 5, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION to Amend complaint in Reference to Defendant City of St. Augustine Beach by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text) (BGR).
October 5, 2020 Filing 32 First MOTION to Amend complaint in Reference to Defendant Deputy Sheriff J. Briggs by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text) (BGR).
October 5, 2020 Filing 31 First MOTION to Amend complaint in Reference to Defendant Officer N. Gillespie by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit text)(BGR).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Kasim Howard's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #9 Natalie Gillespie's motion to dismiss the complaint. Howard must respond to the complaint by October 5, 2020. As instructed, 24, for future unopposed motions, the caption must "include the word 'unopposed,' 'agreed,' or 'stipulated' or otherwise succinctly inform the reader that, as to all or part of the requested relief, no opposition exists." Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/5/2020. (KNR)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED: To the extent that he requests affirmative relief from the Court, #28 Plaintiff's Response to Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants St. John's County Sheriff and Deputy Sheriff Jason W Briggs is DENIED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/1/2020. (MHM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 15, 2020 Filing 26 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BGR)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 10/9/2020. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/1/2021. Discovery due by 9/17/2021. Dispositive motions due by 10/1/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20, #23 Kasim Howard's unopposed motions for extensions of time to respond to the pending motions to dismiss the complaint. By September 30, 2020, Howard must respond to #11 the motion to dismiss by the St. Johns County Sheriff and Jason Briggs. By October 5, 2020, Howard must respond to #14 the motion to dismiss by the City of St. Augustine Beach. For future unopposed motions, the caption must "include the word 'unopposed,' 'agreed,' or 'stipulated' or otherwise succinctly inform the reader that, as to all or part of the requested relief, no opposition exists." See Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/15/2020. (KNR)
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Amended by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 13, 2020 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bradford, Gail)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Kasim Howard's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #9 Natalie Gillespie's motion to dismiss the complaint. Howard must respond to Gillespie's motion by September 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on September 10, 2020. (ASL)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs & St. John's County Sheriff. (Bogan, Bruce) (Modified on 9/10/2020 to edit text) (BGR).
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs. Related case(s): yes (Bogan, Bruce)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to motion to dismiss the complaint by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by City of St. Augustine Beach, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie. (Bradford, Gail)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by City of St. Augustine Beach, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie. Related case(s): yes (Bradford, Gail)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of St. Augustine Beach. (Bradford, Gail)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 the City of St. Augustine Beach's unopposed motion to amend #10 the motion to dismiss the complaint for the reasons stated in the motion. St. Augustine must file the amended motion to dismiss by September 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/1/2020. (KNR)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #10 MOTION to dismiss by City of St. Augustine Beach. (Bradford, Gail) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Modified on 9/1/2020 to add relationship) (BGR).
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs, St. John's County Sheriff. (Bogan, Bruce) (Modified on 8/28/2020 Attorney notified to include complete case number in the future.) (BGR).
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of St. Augustine Beach. (Bradford, Gail)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Officer Natalie L. Gillespie. (Bradford, Gail)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kasim Howard. (Glasser, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kasim Howard. Related case(s): no (Glasser, David) (Modified on 8/27/2020 to edit text) (JDR).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Joy Flood on behalf of St. John's County Sheriff (Flood, Alyssa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of St. Augustine Beach, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie of filing signed Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (signed))(Bradford, Gail)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against City of St. Augustine Beach, Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie, St. John's County Sheriff with Jury Demand filed by Kasim Howard. (Originally filed in State Court on 4/9/2020).(BGR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-939-J-34PDB. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Johns County Circuit Court, case number CA20-0441 filed in State Court on April 9, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17201083 filed by City of St. Augustine Beach, Officer Natalie L. Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradford, Gail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. St. John's County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasim Howard
Represented By: David W. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Augustine Beach
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Natalie L. Gillespie
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John's County Sheriff
Represented By: Bruce R. Bogan
Represented By: Melissa Jean Sydow
Represented By: Alyssa Joy Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Jason W. Briggs
Represented By: Bruce R. Bogan
Represented By: Melissa Jean Sydow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?