Cohen v. Kellogg
Appellee: Joseph Patrick Kellogg
Appellant: Aaron R. Cohen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00989
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File and Serve Appellate Briefs. Appellant's initial brief due November 12, 2020. Appellee's responsive brief due December 11, 2020. Appellant's reply brief due January 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/13/2020. (JW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs by Aaron R. Cohen. (Brown, Jacob)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Aaron R. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 1, #2 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 10, #3 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 11, #4 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 12, #5 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 13, #6 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 2, #7 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 3, #8 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 4, #9 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 5, #10 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 6, #11 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 7, #12 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 8, #13 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit 9, #14 3-19-bk-3254_Debtpr Exhibit List, #15 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 1, #16 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 10, #17 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 11, #18 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 12, #19 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 13, #20 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 14, #21 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 2, #22 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 3, #23 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 4, #24 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 5, #25 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 6, #26 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 7, #27 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 8, #28 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit 9, #29 3-19-bk-3254_Tristee Exhibit Index)(CP)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Aaron R. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 2a Notice of Appeal, #2 2b Notice of Appeal_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #3 2c Notice of Appeal_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #4 2d Memorandum Decision, #5 2e Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #6 2f Notice of_Appeal_Cover_Sheet, #7 2g Appellant_Designation, #8 2h Docket, #9 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000011_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions__Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_Jacob_A_Br, #10 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000012_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_the_Personal_Property_to_the_extent_that_t, #11 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000013_Notice_of_2004_Examination_of_Joseph_Patrick_Kellogg_Filed_by_Jacob_A_Brown_on_behalf_of, #12 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000014_Response_to_Objection_to_Exemptions_Filed_by_Bryan_K_Mickler_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Joseph_P, #13 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000015_Response_to_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_Filed_by_Bryan_K_Mickler_on_behalf_of_Debtor, #14 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000033_Motion_For_Partial_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Jacob_A_Brown_on_behalf_of_Trustee_Aaron_R, #15 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000036_Amended_Schedule_C_wAttached_Declaration_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_A, #16 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000037_Response_to_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Albert_H_Mickler_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Jos, #17 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000038_Reply_to_Kelloggs_Legal_Response_to_Trustees_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Jacob, #18 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000039_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions__Filed_by_Jacob_A_Brown_on_behalf_of_Trustee_A, #19 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000040_Trustee Exhibits, #20 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000042_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_and_Expanding_the_Scope_of_the_Trial_set_for_Feb, #21 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000045_Debtor's Exhibits, #22 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000048_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Debtor_from_Hearing_Held_on_22720, #23 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000049_Annotated_Exhibit_List_of_Chapter_7_Trustee_from_Hearing_Held_on_22720, #24 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000050_Partial_Order_Sustaining_in_Part_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #25 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000051_Partial_Order_Granting_Trustees_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_of_the_Estate_in_Part, #26 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000059_Memorandum_Decision_and_Order_Overruling_in_Part_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #27 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000061_Part_1_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_February_27_2020_on_Trustees_Motion_for_Turnover_Obje, #28 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000061_Part_2_Signature_Page, #29 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000063_Motion_for_Reconsideration, #30 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000064_Response_to_Trustees_Motion_for_Reconsideration_Filed_by_Albert_H_Mickler_on_behalf_of_D, #31 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000065_Reply_to_Debtors_Response_to_Trustees_Motion_for_Reconsideration_Filed_by_Jacob_A_Brown, #32 3-19-bk-03254_Docket_000067_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Memorandum_Decision_and_Order_Overruling_in_P)(CP)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of service by Aaron R. Cohen re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice . (Attachments: #1 Notice of Designation Under Local Rule 3.05 (Bankruptcy Appeal) (Doc. 2))(Brown, Jacob)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1 (Bankruptcy Appeal). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/15/2020. (JW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Aaron R. Cohen. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:19-bk-03254-JAF. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SJW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph Patrick Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron R. Cohen
Represented By: Jacob Aaron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?