Torres v. Cubesmart Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sheltalee Torres
Defendant: Cubesmart LP, Cubesmart Management, LLC and Cubesmart Management, LLC doing business as Cubesmart Self Storage
Case Number: 3:2020cv01137
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Neil Flaxman. (Flaxman, Neil)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 the motion for an extension of time to respond to #3 the amended complaint. The defendants must respond to the amended complaint by January 25, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/16/2020. (KNR)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY PENDING MEDIATION by Cubesmart LP, Cubesmart Management, LLC. (Bacigalupo, Franco) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 11/9/2020 (KKH).
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 11/6/2020 (KKH).
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 10/27/2020 (KKH).
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 10/26/2020 (KKH).
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 10/23/2020 (KKH).
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Feldman, Mitchell) (Modified on 10/19/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Williams on behalf of Sheltalee Torres (Williams, Benjamin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action Form by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Mitchell) Modified to edit text on 10/7/2020 (KKH).
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Cubesmart LP, Cubesmart Management, LLC. (KKH)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-1137-J-32PDB. (SJB)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17390549) filed by Sheltalee Torres. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Cubesmart Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart LP
Represented By: Franco D. Bacigalupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart Management, LLC doing business as Cubesmart Self Storage
Represented By: Franco D. Bacigalupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheltalee Torres
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?