York v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC., et al
Plaintiff: Charles York
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01152
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bright, Amanda)
November 10, 2020 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of Florida as case 9:20-cv-82054, filed on 11/10/2020. (SJW)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order electronically transferring case to: Southern District of Florida. MDL case number: 2924 (SJW)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-1152-J-20PDB. (SJB)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles York with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17411615) filed by Charles York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bright, Amanda) Modified on 10/13/2020 - counsel notified to be sure to add all parties at case opening, counsel was also provided via email the standard AO form for a civil summons in order to resubmit proposed summons. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles York
Represented By: Amanda Anderson Bright
Represented By: George Beckus
Represented By: Gordon Fenderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?