McCullough v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jean McCullough
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01164
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Strike Jury Demand , #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Strike Jury Demand , #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jean McCullough. (Crowley, Kathleen)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand on or before December 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/17/2020. (MM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before December 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/16/2020. (MM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jean McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff Jean McCullough in Support of Motion for Remand)(Crowley, Kathleen)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Strike Jury Demand by Jean McCullough. (Crowley, Kathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Strike Jury Demand by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Conner, Timothy)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before October 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/21/2020. (MM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Gropper, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GuideWell Mutual Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate Florida Blue for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc... (Conner, Timothy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 9/14/2020) against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Jean McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AEJ)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-1164-J-20MCR. (SJB)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 019-CA-2057 filed in State Court on 09/14/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17424918 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exh 1A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exh 1B, #3 State Court Other Documents Exh 1C, #4 Exhibit Exh 2, #5 Exhibit Exh 3, #6 Exhibit Exh 4, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conner, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Conner
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Jennifer A. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean McCullough
Represented By: Michael Fox Orr
Represented By: Kathleen Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?