Woodard v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Defendant: E. Perez, A. Robinson and Norris
Case Number: 3:2020cv01207
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00313. File received electronically
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #4) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 10/26/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
October 22, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re: #4 Report and Recommendation. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Complaint. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall mail this Report and Recommendation to Plaintiff at the Reception and Medical Center in Lake Butler, Florida. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/23/2020. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/21/2020.) (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
June 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORRIS, E PEREZ, and A ROBINSON, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (cle)*** No Service Copies provided.*** [Transferred from flnd on 10/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?