Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant. and JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01276
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #9 the defendant's motion to dismiss. The plaintiff must respond to the motion to dismiss by January 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/21/2020. (BLW)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Young, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keller, Courtney)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Keller, Courtney) (Modified on 12/14/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A... (Keller, Courtney)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.. (Young, James)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Keller, Courtney) (Modified on 11/13/2020 to edit docket text) (JDR).
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Originally Filed on 10/09/2020)(JDR)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-1276-J-32PDB. (LRB)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Defendant. (Keller, Courtney) (Modified on 11/13/2020 edit docket text)(JDR).
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, In and For Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2020-CA-006051-MA filed in State Court on 10/09/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17537825 filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keller, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: James Richard Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Defendant.
Represented By: Courtney M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Courtney M. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?