Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Fred Pennington Brooks, III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01314
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDR)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER advising pro se Plaintiff of some procedural rules with which he must comply. Plaintiff shall perfect service of process by February 17, 2021. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/9/2020. (RLS)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/8/2020. (RLS)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Unilateral CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Fred Pennington Brooks, III. (JDR)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Fred Pennington Brooks, III. (JDR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/24/2020. (MD)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). On or before December 11, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a new application that is properly signed and dated. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 11/20/2020. (RLS)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (JDR)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Fred Pennington Brooks, III. (JDR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Modified on 11/23/2020 STRICKEN without prejudice per Order #4)(JDR).
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Fred Pennington Brooks, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(No Service Copies)(JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Pennington Brooks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?