NRP Lease Holdings, LLC v. Live Oak Banking Company
In Re: NRP Lease Holdings, LLC
Appellant: 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC
Appellee: Live Oak Banking Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01344
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 APPENDIX re #7 Appellant's brief - bankrupty by 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7)(Thames, Richard)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 APPELLANT'S BRIEF by 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC. (Thames, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/17/2020. (MD)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 3-20-ap-00071_2_000020_Notice_of_Appeal, #2 3-20-ap-00071_3_000021_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Richard_R_Tha, #3 3-20-ap-00071_4_000028_Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Richard_R_Thames_on_behalf_of_Plaintiff_1944_Beach, #4 3-20-ap-00071_5_000017_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_of_Plaintiff_and_Granting_Defendants_Cross-Moti, #5 3-20-ap-00071_6_000019_Judgment_in_Favor_of_Defendant_Service_Instructions_Clerks_Office_to_serve, #6 3-20-ap-00071_7_Docket, #7 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000001_Complaint_by_1944_Beach_Boulevard_LLC_against_Live_Oak_Banking_Company_Filing_Fee_Not_Re, #8 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000004_Part_1_Answer_to_Complaint_and_Affirmative_Denenses_To_Complaint_To_Determine_Validity_Priority, #9 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000004_Part_2_Exhibit, #10 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000004_Part_3_Exhibit, #11 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000004_Part_4_Exhibit, #12 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000010_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_Richard_R_Thames_on_behalf, #13 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000011_Affidavit_of_Henry_P_Woodburn_III_in_Support_of_Plaintiffs_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_F, #14 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000012_Affidavit_of_Shelley_A_Jenkins_in_Support_of_Plaintiffs_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_File, #15 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000015_Part_1_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_and_Defendants_Cross-Motion_for_Summ, #16 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000015_Part_2_Declaration_in_Support_of_Cross-MSJ, #17 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000015_Part_3_Declaration_in_Support_of_Cross-MSJ, #18 3-20-ap-00071_Docket_000015_Part_4_Declaration_in_Support_of_Cross-MSJ)(CP)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Adventure Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate NRP Lease Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate 8333 W 21st Street N, LLC, Other Affiliate 1010 N Webb Road, LLC, Other Affiliate 8350 Lyra Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate 5890 Scarborough Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate 10735 E. Hwy 40, LLC, Other Affiliate 2780 SR16, LLC, Other Affiliate 2400 Sheridan Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate 1600 Stratford, LLC, Other Affiliate 3660 East Franklin Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 4825 Blanding Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 3311 Capital Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 17717 Coit Road, LLC, Other Affiliate 2590 Water Park Drive, LLC for 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC.. (Thames, Richard)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Live Oak Banking Company identifying Corporate Parent Live Oak Bancshares, Inc. for Live Oak Banking Company.. (Scrivanich, Ezra)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Z. Scrivanich on behalf of Live Oak Banking Company (Scrivanich, Ezra)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 3-20-bk-02387-JAF. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 11/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SJW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRP Lease Holdings, LLC v. Live Oak Banking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NRP Lease Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 1944 Beach Boulevard, LLC
Represented By: Richard Roemheld Thames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Live Oak Banking Company
Represented By: Ezra Z. Scrivanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?