Johnson v. D. O. T. et al
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson
Defendant: U. S. Government, United Nations, D. O. T. and Trump and Obama Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01401
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for foreign policy procedure criminal courts United States conflict of interest filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #9 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A) filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #5 Case Management Report, #6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion Disbarment Judges State & Federal Judges 28 U.S. codes 177 filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for United Nations Ethics Commitee filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #13 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Clarence D. Johnson, #10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion to squash all statements from all court G45 government entrapment cases filed by Clarence D. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/26/2021. (ADM)
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re #8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for foreign policy procedure criminal courts United States conflict of interest by Clarence D. Johnson. (KEM)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion to squash all statements from all court G45 government entrapment cases by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A) by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for foreign policy procedure criminal courts United States conflict of interest by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion for United Nations Ethics Commitee by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Motion Disbarment Judges State & Federal Judges 28 U.S. codes 177 by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT filed by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (TPL)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's compliance due 1/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/15/2020. (ADM)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. O. T., Trump and Obama Administration, U. S. Government, United Nations with Jury Demand filed by Clarence D. Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. D. O. T. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. O. T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump and Obama Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?