Beck v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary M. Beck
Defendant: Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Ian Drysdale
Case Number: 3:2021cv00037
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Gary M. Beck. (Pickles, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/3/2021. (AMP)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief by Gary M. Beck. (Pickles, Joseph)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 6)(Hayden, Brian)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gary M. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Pickles, Joseph)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Notice of Removal by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hayden, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(KEM)(Originally filed in State Court 7/1/2019)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Gary M. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEM)(Originally filed in State Court 3/22/2019)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Margulies on behalf of Ian Drysdale, Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Margulies, Richard)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0037-J-39JRK. (SJB)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Johns County Circuit Court, case number CA19-0384 filed in State Court on 03/22/2019. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17760615 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayden, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elavon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Drysdale
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M. Beck
Represented By: Michael Fox Orr
Represented By: John Michael Traynor
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Pickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?