Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.562 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: 0.562 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Unknown Owners, Alice Eubanks, Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Alice Eubanks and Katherine Lewis
Case Number: 3:2021cv00236
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Katherine Lewis. (Brigham, Andrew)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Katherine Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. Initial Offer dated 12.10.20 PUTN-008 Eubanks, #2 Exhibit Exh B. Durrance App Rpt 12.05.20 PUTN-008.00 Eubanks)(Brigham, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 24 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Alice Eubanks (JDR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners (JDR)
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Alice Eubanks, Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 21, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER, Objections, Affirmative defenses, Demand for full compensation, and Jury Trial re #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Katherine Lewis.(Brigham, Andrew) (Modified on 4/22/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #19 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
April 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Prince Brigham on behalf of Katherine Lewis (Brigham, Andrew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: The Palarka Daily News Date(s) of publication 03/16/2021; 03/23/2021; 03/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Adding Defendant, Katherine Lewis a/k/a Katherine Eubanks by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 4/6/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/10/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0236-TJC-PDB. (SJB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17977882) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.562 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.562 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of the Estate of Alice Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Lewis
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Brett Stephan Tensfeldt
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?