Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.369 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership LTD, Unknown Owners, 0.369 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida, Carl C Summerson, The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership, LTD. and Carl C. Summerson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00243
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carl C. Summerson. (Brigham, Andrew)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Carl C. Summerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. Initial Offer 12.18.20 COLU-082 Summerson, #2 Exhibit Exh B. Durrance App Rpt 12.05.20 COLU-082 Summerson)(Brigham, Andrew)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners (BGR)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Carl C. Summerson.(Brigham, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #22 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: The Lake City Reporter Date(s) of publication 03/24/2021; 03/31/2021; 04/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership, LTD. (BGR)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Clerk's Default against The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership, LTD. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, Carl C. Summerson, shall file his answer and response to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on or before April 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/5/2021. (ADM)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time & Supporting Memorandum of Law by Carl C. Summerson. (Brigham, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Modified on 4/1/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF of service executed on 3/11/2021 as to The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/30/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF of service executed on 3/17/2021 as to Carl Summerson by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/30/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0243-MMH-MCR. (SJB)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17980676) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.369 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.369 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl C Summerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William & Melodie Douglas Family Limited Partnership, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl C. Summerson
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?