Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: +/- 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida, Unknown Owners, American Telephone & Telegraph Company, Jason Kent Waters and 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida
Case Number: 3:2021cv00249
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners (BGR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 29, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Disclaimer of Interest by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 16, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #24 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/15/2021. (TAM)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Union County Times Date(s) of publication 03/25/2021; 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 8, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 6, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kathy Ford. (Wade, Russell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Modified on 4/7/2021: motion filed in wrong case, see case 3:21-cv-225-MMH-PDB for correct case (BGR)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/2/2021. (TAM)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Telephone & Telegraph Company. (Boese, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason Kent Waters.(Tomkiewicz, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Tomkiewicz on behalf of Jason Kent Waters (Tomkiewicz, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service executed on 3/11/2021 as to AT&T by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/23/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service executed on 3/11/2021 as to Jason Kent Waters by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/23/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/19/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0249-MMH-JBT. (SJB)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17985506) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint) (Sharma, Prineet) (Corrected PDF attachment(s) added on 3/10/2021) (SMS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: +/- 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Telephone & Telegraph Company
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kent Waters
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tomkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.919 Acres of Land in Union County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?