Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.041 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Stephanie DeBose, Archie Randall, Nathaniel Randall, Jr., Anthony Randall, Gilbert Randall, Deveda J. Jackson, Barbara Randall, Bernice Randall, Unknown Owners, Dequilla Randall, 0.041 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida, Reginald S. Randall, Nathaniel Randall, Sr. and Gregory Randall, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00288
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 42 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Owners (JDR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 41 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nathaniel Randall, Sr. (JDR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 40 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dequilla Randall (JDR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 39 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anthony Randall (JDR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 38 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Stephanie DeBose (JDR)
May 7, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Stephanie DeBose, Anthony Randall, Dequilla Randall, Nathaniel Randall, Sr., Unknown Owners by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 26, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Archie Randall. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JDR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 35 PROOF of publication filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Newspaper: Palatka Daily News Date(s) of publication 04/01/2021; 04/08/2021; 04/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
April 16, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of service by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC re #28 Order, . (Sharma, Prineet)
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Randall, Sr. (JDR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nathaniel Randall, Jr. (JDR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gilbert Randall (JDR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 30 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bernice Randall (JDR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Barbara Randall (JDR)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OMNIBUS ORDER setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motions for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the motions is set for June 2, 2021, at 3:00 P.M. before the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2021. (JHC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Barbara Randall, Bernice Randall, Gilbert Randall, Nathaniel Randall, Jr., Gregory Randall, Sr. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 14, 2021 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Reginald S. Randall (JDR)
April 14, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Deveda J. Jackson (JDR)
April 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Deveda J. Jackson, Reginald S. Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 8, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2021. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Archie Randall. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KKH)
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2021 as to Archie Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/31/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/26/2021 (KKH).
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 03/23/2021 as to Bernice Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 03/22/2021 as to Barbara Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 03/22/2021 as to Gregory Randall, Sr. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 03/22/2021 as to Gilbert Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 03/22/2021 as to Nathaniel Randall, Jr. by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 03/19/2021 as to Reginald S Randall by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 03/19/2021 as to Daveda J Jackson by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) (Modified on 3/24/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0288-TJC-JRK. (SJB)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17999811) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.041 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie DeBose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Randall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deveda J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dequilla Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.041 Acres of Land in Putnam County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald S. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Randall, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Randall, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?