Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.864 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Shawn D. Smyth, Unknown Owners, Martha Ellen Smyth, 0.864 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida and Florida Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2021cv00291
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing action without prejudice. The Clerk shall term any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/31/2021. (JHC)
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 RETRUN of service as to Martha Ellen Smyth, executed 3/23/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/30/2021 (KKH).
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service as to Shawn Smyth, executed on 3/2/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/30/2021 (KKH).
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service as to Florida Credit Union, executed on 3/26/21 by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/30/2021 (KKH).
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Prineet D. Sharma on behalf of Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC (Sharma, Prineet) Modified to edit text on 3/26/2021 (KKH).
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (SMS)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0291-TJC-JRK. (SJB)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Porter re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diego Aponte re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Adam Broad re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC.. (Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sharma, Prineet)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-18000699) filed by Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Sharma, Prineet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC v. 0.864 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn D. Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Ellen Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.864 Acres of Land in Columbia County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Prineet D. Sharma
Represented By: Igmedio E. Pantaleon
Represented By: Ivonne Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?