Wescott v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Carl Wescott
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, Joseph Martin and Leigh Lightfoot
Case Number: 3:2021cv00319
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing that no later than 6/14/2021, Plaintiff shall 1) file a written show cause response stating why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and 2) either file an Amended Complaint or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/6/2021. (BHC)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; on or before 4/26/2021, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with this Order or pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/25/2021. (BHC)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carl Wescott. (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 25, Leigh Lightfoot, Joseph Martin with Jury Demand filed by Carl Wescott (no service copies provide). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wescott v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?