Hampton v. MTC Medical, LLC
Plaintiff: LaTroy Hampton
Defendant: MTC Medical, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00449
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Brezinski, Katherine)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lanier Viker on behalf of LaTroy Hampton (Viker, Katherine)
June 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Katherine Viker on behalf of LaTroy Hampton (Mattox, Marie) (Modified on 6/14/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #12 Defendant's Case Management Report. Joint Uniform Case Management Report due June 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/3/2021. (JW)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Swiger, Lindsay) (Modified on 6/3/2021, STRICKEN per #13 order) (BGR).
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by MTC Medical, LLC. (Swiger, Lindsay)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE: Upon review of #9 Defendant's Corrected Response to the Court's April 27, 2021 Order, the Court's sua sponte inquiry into its subject matter jurisdiction is satisfied. (TMF)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 CORRECTED RESPONSE re #5 Order filed by MTC Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Stephanie Hall, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Virginia Jones)(Swiger, Lindsay) (Modified on 5/12/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order filed by MTC Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Virginia Jones)(Swiger, Lindsay) (Modified on 5/12/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiff may file a corrected complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before May 21, 2021. If Plaintiff does not file a corrected complaint, the Court will treat Count II of the Complaint as asserting only a claim of disparate treatment discrimination. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/6/2021.(TMF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by MTC Medical, LLC.(Swiger, Lindsay)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: Defendant MTC Medical, LLC shall have until May 11, 2021, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/27/2021. (TMF)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against MTC Medical, LLC with Jury Demand filed by LaTroy Hampton (originally filed in Putnam County Circuit Court on 1/2/2021).(BGR)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-0449-MMH-PDB. (SJB)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Putnam County, Florida, case number 21-CA-0001 filed in State Court on 1/02/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18172514 filed by MTC Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #6 Exhibit B - Declaration of M. Petrogeorge, #7 Exhibit C - Declaration of S. Hall)(Swiger, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. MTC Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Medical, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Dennis Swiger
Represented By: Katherine Baldwin Brezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTroy Hampton
Represented By: Marie A. Mattox
Represented By: Katherine Lanier Viker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?