Fletcher v. United States of America (IRS)
Plaintiff: john l. fletcher
Defendant: United States of America (IRS)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00526
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6532
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service by John L. Fletcher (Farmer, Aaron)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by John L. Fletcher (Farmer, Aaron)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service as to U.S. Attorney's Office executed on 6/8/2021 by John L. Fletcher (Farmer, Aaron) (Modified on 6/16/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America (IRS). (RH)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by John L. Fletcher. (Farmer, Aaron)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0526-MMH-MCR. (SJB)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John L. Fletcher against United States of America (IRS) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18281985) filed by John L. Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farmer, Aaron) Modified on 5/25/2021 to edit text (RH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: john l. fletcher
Represented By: Aaron A. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?