Coffman et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. Coffman and Victoria L. Corneilson
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. and American Residential Services, LLC doing business as Florida Home Air Conditioning
Case Number: 3:2021cv00706
Filed: July 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enlarge the Time to Respond to Count IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Court will set a deadline to respond when it rules on the Motion to Dismiss Counts VI through VIII. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/3/2021. (MAM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss to Counts VI through VIII of #3 Complaint with Supporting Memorandum of Law, MOTION for Enlarge the Time to Respond to Count IV and V of #3 Complaint, and Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(G) by American Residential Services, LLC. (Glassman, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss with Supporting Memorandum of Law and Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01 (G) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Glassman, Jeffrey) (Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint, Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g), and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Defendants shall have up to and including 8/31/2021 to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. No. 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/12/2021. (MDC)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to #3 Complaint by American Residential Services, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Glassman, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Modified on 8/11/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Glassman on behalf of American Residential Services, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Glassman, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to American Residential Services, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (JDR)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., American Residential Services, LLC d/b/a/ Florida Home Air Conditioning with Jury Demand filed by Rebecca A. Coffman and Victoria L. Corneilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coffman's Contract/Check Payment To Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Coffman's Contract With American Residential Services, LLC d/b/a/ Florida Home Air Conditioning, #3 Exhibit C - American Residential Services and Florida Home Air Conditioning Additional Work Invoices and Charges, #4 Exhibit D - Coffman's November 23, Florida Statute, Chapter 558 Defective Construction Notice, #5 Proposed Summons For American Residential Services, LLC d/b/a Florida Home Air Conditioning, #6 Proposed Summons For Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.)(Jones, J.) Modified on 7/20/2021 (JDR).
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-0706-TJC-JRK. (SJB)
July 18, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BFLMDC-18487196) filed by Rebecca A. Coffman.(Jones, J.) (Modified on 7/19/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffman et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. Coffman
Represented By: J. Eric Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria L. Corneilson
Represented By: J. Eric Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Glassman
Represented By: William Glenn Kemper Smoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Residential Services, LLC doing business as Florida Home Air Conditioning
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Glassman
Represented By: William Glenn Kemper Smoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?