Glover Construction Co., Inc. v. The City of Jacksonville et al
Plaintiff: Glover Construction Co., Inc. and Glover Construction Co., Inc. A North Carolina corporation doing business as Glover Construction Corporation of North Carolina
Defendant: The City of Jacksonville and The Chemours Company TT, LLC
Cross Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00802
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The parties must file a case management report within forty days of a ruling on the motion to consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/15/2021. (BHC)
October 14, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Adams, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
October 1, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY re #15 Answer to Crossclaim and Counterclaim against City by The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Cole, Edward) Modified text on 10/4/2021. (AEP)
October 1, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter Count III, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count III by The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Cole, Edward)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Glover Construction Co., Inc. (Adams, Adam)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to #15 Counterclaim by Glover Construction Co., Inc..(Adams, Adam)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 The Chemours Company FC, LLC's, unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #3 the amended complaint. The Chemours Company must respond to the amended complaint by October 1, 2021. For future motions, please see Local Rule 3.01(g)(2), which directs use of the heading, "Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification." Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/13/2021. (BHC)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company TT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Chemours Company for The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company TT, LLC.. (Cole, Edward)
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company TT, LLC. (Cole, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against The Chemours Company FC, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Glover Construction Co., Inc. by The City of Jacksonville.(Joyce, Patrick)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:21-cv-802-BJD-PDB. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Glover Construction Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Adams, Adam)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested parties by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adams, Adam) (Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Brian J. Davis for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/31/2021. (MD)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has alleged diversity jurisdiction as the sole basis for filing this case in federal court. See Civil cover sheet, Doc. 1 at Ex. 3. "Diversity jurisdiction requires complete diversity; every plaintiff must be diverse from every defendant." Flintlock Constr. Servs., LLC v. Well-Come Holdings, LLC, 710 F.3d 1221, 1224 (11th Cir. 2013) (citation omitted). The citizenship of limited liability companies depends on the citizenship of each member. See Rolling Greens MHP, L.P. v. Comcast SCH Holdings, L.L.C., 374 F.3d 1020, 1022 (11th Cir. 2004). The Court is unable to determine from the allegations of the complaint whether it has subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall therefore file a certificate of interested parties or some other supplemental filing no later than September 20, 2021 stating the names and citizenship of each member of defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/25/2021. (MD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to The Chemours Company TT, LLC, The City of Jacksonville. (JDR)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Adams, Adam)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Adams, Adam)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Consolidate by Glover Construction Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adams, Adam) Modified to edit text on 8/24/2021 (KKH).
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Adams, Adam) Modified to edit text on 8/24/2021 (KKH).
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Chemours Company TT, LLC, The City of Jacksonville filed by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Adams, Adam)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-802-TJC-PDB. (LRB)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Chemours Company TT, LLC, The City of Jacksonville (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18612916) filed by Glover Construction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover Construction Co., Inc. v. The City of Jacksonville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glover Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glover Construction Co., Inc. A North Carolina corporation doing business as Glover Construction Corporation of North Carolina
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Mazzeo
Represented By: Adam G. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Jacksonville
Represented By: Christopher M. Garrett
Represented By: Tiffiny Douglas Pinkstaff
Represented By: Wiley Braxton Gillam, IV
Represented By: Patrick W. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company TT, LLC
Represented By: Edward Bates Cole
Represented By: Thomas O'Neal Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Represented By: Edward Bates Cole
Represented By: Thomas O'Neal Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?