Nature's Way Products, LLC et al v. Alive by Nature, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nature's Way Products, LLC, Nature's Way Brands, LLC and Schwabe North America, Inc.
Defendant: Alive by Nature, Inc. and Bryan Nettles
Case Number: 3:2021cv00824
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/23/2021 by Nature's Way Products, LLC, Schwabe North America, Inc., Nature's Way Brands, LLC as to Bryan Nettles. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/23/2021 by Nature's Way Products, LLC, Schwabe North America, Inc., Nature's Way Brands, LLC as to Alive by Nature, Inc.. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If attorneys Edward R. Williams, Jr., Aaron T. Olejniczak, and Christopher R. Liro have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/27/2021. (MM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (KKH)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Alive by Nature, Inc., Bryan Nettles. (KKH)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0824-TJC-MCR. (SJB)
August 25, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18631457 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R. Williams, Jr.. (Vermut, Richard)
August 25, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18631442 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Liro. (Vermut, Richard)
August 25, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18631413 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Aaron T. Olejniczak. (Vermut, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Christopher R. Liro to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Vermut, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Aaron T. Olejniczak to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Vermut, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward R. Williams, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Vermut, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nature's Way Brands, LLC, Nature's Way Products, LLC, Schwabe North America, Inc.. (Vermut, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Supplement Report on Filing/Determination of Action Regarding Trademark, #17 Supplement Report on Filing/Determination of Action Regarding Trademark, #18 Supplement Report on Filing/Determination of Action Regarding Trademark)(Vermut, Richard) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nature's Way Products, LLC et al v. Alive by Nature, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nature's Way Products, LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Vermut
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Represented By: Christopher R. Liro
Represented By: Edward R. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nature's Way Brands, LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Vermut
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Represented By: Christopher R. Liro
Represented By: Edward R. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwabe North America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Vermut
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Represented By: Christopher R. Liro
Represented By: Edward R. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alive by Nature, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?