Gutierrez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Heraclio Gutierrez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00938
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Heraclio Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Initial Brief, #2 Exhibit 2, Gov't Proposed Plea Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3, Gov't cover letter re Plea Agreement)(Kent, William) (Modified on 11/10/2021 to edit docket text and event type) (JDR).
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Heraclio Gutierrez re #4 MOTION to File Excess Pages (As to the Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Gutierrez's 2255 Petition - In Excess of the Page Limit Set in This Court's Order Doc. 2) of Government's Position on Motion to Exceed Page Limit (Kent, William)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in support re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Motion to File Excess Pages filed by Heraclio Gutierrez. (Kent, William)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to File Excess Pages (As to the Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Gutierrez's 2255 Petition - In Excess of the Page Limit Set in This Court's Order Doc. 2) by Heraclio Gutierrez. (Kent, William)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Heraclio Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Appeal Brief, #2 Exhibit B - Government Proposed Plea Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Government Cover Letter with Proposed Plea Agreement)(Kent, William) (Modified on 10/21/2021 to edit docket text and event type) (JDR).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Petitioner to file an amended motion to vacate and memorandum no later than October 22, 2021. See Order for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/23/2021. (JHC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 3:17-cr-225-TJC-MCR filed by Heraclio Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Insert 9f, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(KKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heraclio Gutierrez
Represented By: Ryan Edward McFarland
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Julie Hackenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?