Lopez Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00943
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. (Fugate, Shea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. Related case(s): No (Fugate, Shea)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on October 4, 2021 by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez as to U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fugate, Shea) (Modified on 10/6/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on October 4, 2021 by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fugate, Shea)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed on 9/30/2021 by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez as to U.S. Attorney's Office (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fugate, Shea). (Modified on 10/6/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BGR)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. (Fugate, Shea)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. (Fugate, Shea)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. (Fugate, Shea)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (BGR)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0943-MMH-MCR. (SJB)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18726251) filed by Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fugate, Shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoilo Juan Lopez Martinez
Represented By: Shea A. Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?