South of Bay Street, LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SOUTH OF BAY STREET, LLC
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01078
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
2 Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Five Canons, LLC, Other Affiliate Dark Horse Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Adam Schaffer, Other Affiliate Mark Sizemore for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Lokuta, Katelyn)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Komando, Richard) (Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by South of Bay Street, LLC. (Komando, Richard)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:21-cv-1078-TJC-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (LRB)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of plaintiffs' notice of related cases, the parties to both cases are directed to confer and advise the Court at the time they file their case management reports (due 40 days after removal; see Local Rule 3.02(b)(2)) as to whether these cases should be consolidated for discovery or other purposes, including trial. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/15/2021. (SRW)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Lewis, William)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by South of Bay Street, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Komando, Richard)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial to Complaint by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Lewis, William) (Modified on 11/5/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Katelyn N. Lokuta of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by South of Bay Street, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JDR)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-1078-TJC-JRK. (SJB)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial, case number 2021 CA 003535 filed in State Court on 6/25/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18865651 filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Coversheet, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South of Bay Street, LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH OF BAY STREET, LLC
Represented By: Richard Christian Komando
Represented By: Jonathan Converse Buckland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: William Roderick Lewis
Represented By: Katelyn N. Lokuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?