Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc., Ruben Sanchez and Laura E. Trujillo
Case Number: 3:2021cv01097
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Zelonka, Richard)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to Amend Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Add Party Defendant. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before December 30, 2021. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint within 21 days of its filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/23/21. (AJS)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosures by Ruben Sanchez (Weintraub, Arlen) (Modified on 12/27/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint and Add Party Defendant by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended DJ, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Zelonka, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant Ruben Sanchez's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruben Sanchez.(Weintraub, Arlen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlen Mason Weintraub on behalf of Ruben Sanchez (Weintraub, Arlen)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service executed on 12/3/2021 by Atain Specialty Insurance Company as to Ruben Sanchez (Zelonka, Richard) (Modified on 12/22/2021, to edit text) (BGR).
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc.. (Marchione, John)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Regarding Its Duty to Indemnify Or In the Alternative to Stay by T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc.. (Marchione, John)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including December 21, 2021 to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/2/2021. (AJS)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc.. (Marchione, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lawrence Marchione on behalf of T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc. (Marchione, John)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Marie Jarvis Johnson on behalf of T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc. (Johnson, Kristen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Ruben Sanchez, T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc. (BGR)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-1097-MMH-JBT. (SJB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Atain Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AJK HOLDINGS LLC for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Zelonka, Richard)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18874977) filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons T. Disney, #3 Proposed Summons Sanchez, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Zelonka, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard E. Zelonka, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Disney Trucking and Grading, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Marie Jarvis Johnson
Represented By: John Lawrence Marchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Sanchez
Represented By: Arlen Mason Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura E. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?