Perry v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Morris Perry
Defendant: Sally Ross and James Ross
Case Number: 3:2021cv01126
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Morris Perry. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KKH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is due on or before December 22, 2021. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/1/2021. (AJS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost (Long Form) by Morris Perry. (JDR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Ross, Sally Ross filed by Morris Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?