Walker v. West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC
Plaintiff: Rochelle Walker
Defendant: West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC, d/b/a Fouraker Hills Rehab and Nursing Center and West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC doing business as Fouraker Hills Rehab & Nursing Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv01144
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on December14, 2021 by Rochelle Walker as to West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC. (Hill, Brandon)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rochelle Walker. (Hill, Brandon)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rochelle Walker. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC. (JDR)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-1144-TJC-PDB. (MLJ)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC, d/b/a Fouraker Hills Rehab and Nursing Center with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18935147) filed by Rochelle Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Walker
Represented By: Brandon J. Hill
Represented By: Amanda E. Heystek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC, d/b/a Fouraker Hills Rehab and Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jacksonville Care Acquisition, LLC doing business as Fouraker Hills Rehab & Nursing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?