Tisby v. Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC
Plaintiff: Schwann Tisby
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01218
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Stipulation for Remand to State Court (with directions to the Clerk of the Court). Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/21/2021. (JW)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Worley, Steven)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking #1 Notice of Removal and [1-4] Exhibit D and directing the Clerk of the Court to remove these documents from the Court docket. Defendant shall have up to and including December 30, 2021, to file a properly redacted amended notice of removal which provides the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/14/2021. (MHM)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Schwann Tisby. (originally filed in State Court) (RH)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-01218-MMH-MCR. (APV)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial, case number 2021-CA-005783 filed in State Court on 10/28/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19022142 filed by Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Worley, Steven) Modified on 12/14/2021 (1 and 1-4 STRICKEN and Removed per Order doc #5) (RH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tisby v. Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwann Tisby
Represented By: James Curtis Rinaman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Worley
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?