Miller v. Santa Rosa Correctional Institution et al
Plaintiff: Willis Miller
Defendant: Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, J. Santaigo, Major Oaks and Mrs. Bennifeld
Case Number: 3:2021cv01230
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT - Transferred case has been opened in the U.S.D.C. Florida Northern as case 3:21cv4774, filed on 12/23/2021. (LRB)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Florida (SJW)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 12/21/2021. (CAW)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bennifeld, Oaks, Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, J. Santaigo filed by Willis Miller. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no IFP, no service copies, postmarked 12/13/2021) (AEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Santa Rosa Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Santaigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Bennifeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?