Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.139.215.46 and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01245
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to serve subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/14/2022. (ADM)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LEGAL AUTHORITY by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Yetian)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (KKH)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-1245-TJC-MCR. (SJB)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE of Filing Copyright Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Yetian) Per Counsel, amended to include case number Modified to edit text on 12/17/2021 (KKH).
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 Amended NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Wang, Yetian) Per Counsel, amended only to include case number. Modified to edit text on 12/17/2021 (KKH).
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian) Per Counsel, amended to include case number. Modified to edit text on 12/17/2021 (KKH).
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Copyright Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Yetian) Modified to edit text on 12/17/2021 (KKH).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Wang, Yetian)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Wang, Yetian)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.139.215.46 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19038601) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Yetian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Yetian Wang
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.139.215.46
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?