Omni Amelia Island, LLC v. Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Omni Amelia Island, LLC
Defendant: AMELIA ISLAND PLANTATION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01255
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Bond Motion to Dissolve or Discharge Lis Pendens and All Amendments Filed by Plaintiff or Alternatively to Require Plaintiff to Post a Bond filed by Omni Amelia Island, LLC. (Laquidara, Cindy)
February 11, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Omni Amelia Island, LLC. (Laquidara, Cindy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronnie Charles Graham, Sr on behalf of Omni Amelia Island, LLC (Graham, Ronnie)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 the unopposed motion for an extension of time. The deadline to respond to #12 the motion to dismiss and #13 motion to dissolve or discharge the lis pendens is extended to February 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/7/2022. (VNG)
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #13 MOTION for Bond Motion to Dissolve or Discharge Lis Pendens and All Amendments Filed by Plaintiff or Alternatively to Require Plaintiff to Post a Bond by Omni Amelia Island, LLC. (Laquidara, Cindy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel Appearance by Natalie Eve Fina on behalf of Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc. (Fina, Natalie)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dissolve or Discharge Lis Pendens and All Amendments Filed by Plaintiff or Alternatively to Require Plaintiff to Post a Bond by Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc. (Hawes, Trevor) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit docket text (KEM).
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hawes, Trevor)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc.. (Hawes, Trevor)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Hawes on behalf of Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc. (Hawes, Trevor)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of lis pendens by Omni Amelia Island, LLC (Laquidara, Cindy)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Omni Amelia Island, LLC identifying Other Affiliate OHO Corporation for Omni Amelia Island, LLC. (Laquidara, Cindy)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy A. Laquidara on behalf of Omni Amelia Island, LLC (Laquidara, Cindy)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED document by Omni Amelia Island, LLC. Amendment to #2 Notice of lis pendens . (Laquidara, Cindy)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc. (KEM)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-1255-HES-PDB. (SJB)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by Omni Amelia Island, LLC (Laquidara, Cindy)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMELIA ISLAND PLANTATION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19043246) filed by Omni Amelia Island, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Developers Rights, #3 Exhibit AIPCA Covenants, #4 Exhibit Class A Covenants, #5 Exhibit Class B Covenants, #6 Exhibit Waiver of Option to Purchase, #7 Exhibit Board Meeting Minutes, #8 Exhibit Memorandum of Agreement, #9 Exhibit Supplemented Restated Declaration, #10 Exhibit Letter re Covenant Amendments, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons)(Laquidara, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omni Amelia Island, LLC v. Amelia Island Plantation Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Amelia Island, LLC
Represented By: Cindy A. Laquidara
Represented By: Howard Jay Harrington
Represented By: Ronnie Charles Graham, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMELIA ISLAND PLANTATION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Trevor Hawes
Represented By: Natalie Eve Fina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?