Savage v. Racetrac, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendi Savage
Defendant: Racetrac, Inc. and Racetrac Petroleum, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00420
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Strike Negligent Mode of Operations From Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Wendi Savage. (Grissom, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/17/2023; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/15/2023; Discovery deadline is 4/3/2023; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/3/2023; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 5/1/2023; Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2023; All other motions due by 9/14/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheet)(KKH)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/10/2022. (CKM)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Racetrac, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Bannon, Shylie) Modified text on 5/4/2022. (AEP)
May 3, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Negligent Mode of Operations From Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Racetrac, Inc.. (Bannon, Shylie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 28, 2022 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bannon, Shylie)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wendi Savage. (Grissom, Daniel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Wendi Savage. (Grissom, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Racetrac, Inc. (Bannon, Shylie) (Modified on 4/25/2022, to edit text) (BGR).
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Racetrac, Inc.. (Bannon, Shylie)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER confirming that after a review of #1 the Notice of Removal and #8 Defendant's Exhibits to the Notice of Removal, the Court is satisfied that it has jurisdiction over the case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/19/2022. (CKM)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to #1 Notice of Removal by Racetrac, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 RaceTrac Corporate Information, #3 Plaintiff's Demand)(Bannon, Shylie) Modified text on 4/20/2022. (AEP)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER directing Defendant to file Plaintiff's demand letter, referenced in #1 the Notice of Removal, as "Exhibit C," no later than 4/25/2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/15/2022. (CKM)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Racetrac, Inc..(originally filed in State Court) (RH)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Racetrac, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Wendi Savage. (originally filed in State Court) (RH)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Racetrac, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet) (Bannon, Shylie)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:22-cv-00420-TJC-MCR. (APV)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, case number 16-2022-CA-000008 filed in State Court on 04/04/2022. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19457592 filed by Racetrac, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Bannon, Shylie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage v. Racetrac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi Savage
Represented By: Daniel Grissom
Represented By: Daniel M. Grissom
Represented By: Ronald Mark Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racetrac, Inc.
Represented By: Shylie A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racetrac Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Shylie A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?