Sutton v. Tractor Supply Company
Plaintiff: Stefan Sutton
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00429
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEP)
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2022; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/30/2022; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/27/2023; Discovery deadline is 3/3/2023; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/3/2023; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 4/3/2023; Pretrial statement due by 8/17/2023; All other motions due by 8/17/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 9/5/2023 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheet)(KKH)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (George, Edward)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tractor Supply Company. (McKeown, Kerry)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 Tractor Supply Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tractor Supply Company.(George, Edward)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 3/22/2022) against Tractor Supply Company with Jury Demand filed by Stefan Sutton.(AEP)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:22-cv-0429-TJC-JBT. (SJB)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3d Judicial Circuit, Columbia County, Florida, case number 22-CA-0094 filed in State Court on March 22, 2022. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19463345 filed by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 State Court Other Documents, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Tractor Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Sutton
Represented By: Jared Dustin Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Edward Taylor George
Represented By: Kerry McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?