Ray v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Lavario C. Ray
Defendant: Robert Cook, City of Jacksonville, Richard Mantie, Honorable Justice Whitton and Office of the State Attorney, Fourth Judicial Circuit
Case Number: 3:2022cv00887
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order entered on September 16, 2022, judgment is hereby entered DISMISSING this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/20/2022. (AET)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing the case without prejudice, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/16/2022. (SM)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice by Lavario C. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, Court Order, #2 Appendix B, Harrison v. Michigan, #3 Mailing Envelope)(AET) ) (AET).
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lavario C. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AET) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Jacksonville, Robert Cook, Richard Mantie, Office of the State Attorney, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Justice Whitton with Jury Demand filed by Lavario C. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavario C. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jacksonville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mantie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Justice Whitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the State Attorney, Fourth Judicial Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?