Walker v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Walker
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv00150
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer or response due 4/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/7/2023. (MDH)
March 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Magaret Falck Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AET)
March 6, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Thomas Walker. (Farrell, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (BGR)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) which requires the parties to conduct a planning conference and file a case management report. Because Judge Howard schedules ERISA cases differently than the routine civil case, the parties are directed to use Judge Howard's ERISA Case Management Report (instead of the Uniform Case Management Report). This form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for Judge Howard. (JW)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:23-cv-0150-MMH-MCR. (SJB)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20493625) filed by Thomas Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit)(Farrell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Walker
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Magaret Falck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?