Rice v. Wintrust Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Rice
Defendant: Wintrust Financial Corporation, Wintrust Mortgage, Wintrust Residential Mortgage, Barrington Bank & Trust Company NA, W. Bradley "Brad&quot Stetson, U.S. Department Veterans Affairs, National Federal Mortgage Association, Veterans First Mortgage, Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler, Michael A. Popkin, Parker Dean Lewis, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., John Doe, Jane Doe, Wintrust Financial Corporation doing business as Wintrust Mortgage doing business as Wintrust Residential Mortgage, Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., The United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., JP Morgan Chase & Company and Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00296
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROOF of service by Daniel R. Rice (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for a Stay of the Case by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BGR)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Default Judgment against Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A. filed by Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A.. (Zakarian, Albert)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc.. (Zakarian, Albert)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Proposed Unilateral CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Daniel R. Rice. (JDR)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (JDR)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Default Judgment against W. Bradley Stetson "Brad" Chairman/CEO Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A. by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Mailing Envelope)(JDR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DISCLOSURE Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 3.03 by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATEMENT of No Related Action by Daniel R. Rice (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Veterans First Mortgage filed by Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Michael A. Popkin. (Rosaler, Brian)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Veterans First Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation. (Zakarian, Albert)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RETURN of service executed on 4/24/2023 by Daniel R. Rice as to JP Morgan Chase & Company. (BGR)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RETURN of service executed on 4/24/2023 by Daniel R. Rice as to Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (BGR)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RETURN of service executed on 4/24/2023 by Daniel R. Rice as to Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. (BGR)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Service by Daniel R. Rice (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (returned executed summons docketed separately)(BGR)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 3/27/2023 by Daniel R. Rice as to Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A. (BGR)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Parker Dean Lewis. (Zakarian, Albert)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Judicial Misconduct Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 11(a)(b)(1)(2)(3)(4) by Albert Zakarian Notice of Separate 5(C) MOTION Seeking 11(C)(1)(2) Sanctions by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(BGR)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Corrected) RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Veterans First Mortgage. (Zakarian, Albert) Modified text on 4/19/2023 (BD).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Veterans First Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation. (Zakarian, Albert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified text on 4/19/2023 (BD).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Veterans First Mortgage. (Zakarian, Albert) Modified text on 4/19/2023 (BD).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgments by Daniel R. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER informing pro se Plaintiff of some procedural rules with which he must comply. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/13/2023. (KMD)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER striking without prejudice #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by the Wintrust Defendants for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). See M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(g). Counsel must ensure compliance with all local rules in any future filings. A compliant motion must be filed on or before April 25, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/11/2023. (KMD)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Michael A. Popkin. Related case(s): Yes (Rosaler, Brian)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Michael A. Popkin. (Rosaler, Brian)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STRICKEN per Endorsed order 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Veterans First Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation. (Zakarian, Albert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified text on 4/11/2023 (BD).
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert A. Zakarian on behalf of Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Veterans First Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation (Zakarian, Albert)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proof(s) of Service of Process by Daniel R. Rice (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(BGR)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER denying Plaintiff's #6 Notice and Unopposed Motion Seeking the Clerk of Court to (A). Supplement and (B). Amend Section (1)(B)(3)&(4). Plaintiff should consult the Guide for Proceeding Without a Lawyer located under "Litigants without Lawyers" on the Middle District Court of Florida's website (www.flmd.uscourts.gov) for instructions on proper service of process. Plaintiff should also direct any further communication regarding the issuance of summonses in the first instance to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/30/2023. (KMD)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel R. Rice. (BGR)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE and Unopposed MOTION Seeking the Clerk of Court to (A). Supplement and (B). Amend Section (1)(B)(3)&(4) by Daniel R. Rice. (BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., National Federal Mortgage Association, The United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Wintrust Financial Corporation. (BGR)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel R. Rice. (BGR)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to JP Morgan Chase & Company, Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Michael A. Popkin, Veterans First Mortgage. (BGR)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A., Jane Doe, John Doe, JP Morgan Chase & Company, Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A., Parker Dean Lewis, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., National Federal Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Michael A. Popkin, The United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Veterans First Mortgage, Wintrust Financial Corporation with Jury Demand Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 36413 filed by Daniel R. Rice.(BGR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Wintrust Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintrust Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintrust Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintrust Residential Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Bank & Trust Company NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Bradley "Brad&quot Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Federal Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans First Mortgage
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Popkin
Represented By: Brian L. Rosaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Dean Lewis
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintrust Financial Corporation doing business as Wintrust Mortgage doing business as Wintrust Residential Mortgage
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Bank & Trust Company N.A.
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Popkin & Rosaler P.A.
Represented By: Brian L. Rosaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Represented By: Albert A. Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?