Scocozzo v. Rhoden
Petitioner: Anthony Scocozzo
Respondent: Scotty Rhoden
Case Number: 3:2023cv01009
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 4 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SPM) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (CAW).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/15/2023. (JND)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony Scocozzo. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Anthony Scocozzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Mailing Envelope)(No service copies)(BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scocozzo v. Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Scocozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scotty Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?