Oklahoma Apple LLC et al v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Apple LLC, Seestar QSR LLC, Mountain Apple LLC and Julio-Madison LLC
Defendant: The United States Small Business Administration, The United States of America and Isabella Casillas Guzman
Case Number: 3:2024cv00927
Filed: September 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Oklahoma Apple LLC, Julio-Madison LLC, Seestar QSR LLC, Mountain Apple LLC. The United States Small Business Administration served on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Drushal, Amy)
September 23, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Oklahoma Apple LLC, Julio-Madison LLC, Seestar QSR LLC, Mountain Apple LLC. The United States of America served on 9/20/2024, answer due 11/19/2024. (Drushal, Amy)
September 13, 2024 Filing 11 Corrected COMPLAINT re #10 Order against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit B-4)(Drushal, Amy) Modified docket text on 9/13/2024 (EVK).
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER striking #1 Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a corrected complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before September 24, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/10/2024. (MHM)
September 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Vivian Hatzi Basdekis on behalf of Julio-Madison LLC, Mountain Apple LLC, Oklahoma Apple LLC, Seestar QSR LLC. Lead Counsel: Vivian H. Basdekis. (Basdekis, Vivian )
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting docs. #4, #5 Motions for Special Admission. Attorneys Basdekis and Humphrey are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. Counsel shall register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system if they have not already done so. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 9/10/2024. (BJR)
September 10, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Isabella Casillas Guzman, The United States Small Business Administration, The United States of America. (JK)
September 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
September 9, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Blake N. Humphrey to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22497625 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
September 9, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Vivian Basdekis to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22497599 for $150 by Julio-Madison LLC, Mountain Apple LLC, Oklahoma Apple LLC, Seestar QSR LLC. (Drushal, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
September 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Blake N. Humphrey and Vivian Hatzi Basdekis Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
September 9, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:24-cv-927-MMH-LLL. (RLK)
September 9, 2024 Filing 1 STRICKEN PER ORDER 10. COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22494870) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit B3, #8 Exhibit B4, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons)(Drushal, Amy) Modified on 9/11/2024 (HAI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Apple LLC et al v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Apple LLC
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seestar QSR LLC
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Apple LLC
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio-Madison LLC
Represented By: Amy Lea Drushal
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Represented By: Vivian Hatzi Basdekis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?