Moss v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Eleanor C. Moss
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 5:2010cv00104
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Presiding Judge: Gary R. Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting [Doc. 70] Plaintiff's Motion to compel depositionsof John Quagliato, Sallie Curie and Gary Gertz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/17/2012. (AR)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to compel production of documents claimed privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 5/9/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER authorizing Michael R. Santana to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/21/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 45 Motion to strike GEICO's second affirmative defense with ten days leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/15/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to strike defendant's objection to Request for Production No. 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/2/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 Motion for more definite statement of defendant's second affirmative defense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/19/2011. (Smith, Thomas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor C. Moss
Represented By: Keith R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Megan Marie Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?