Torrey v. Marion County School Board et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Torrey
Defendant: Marion County School Board, James A. Yancey, William Haldin, Beverly Morris, John McCollum, George Don Raymond, Diana Greene and Ron Crawford
Case Number: 5:2012cv00662
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Presiding Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to extend time; granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 3/19/2014). The Clerk is directed to enter an Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. See Order for Details.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/12/2014. (JWM)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice 55 Motion for Sanctions; granting 57 Motion for Leave to File; granting 58 Motion to extend time; granting 60 Motion to extend time; granting 66 Motion to extend time. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/4/2014. (JWM)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion regarding electronically viewing and receiving documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/15/2013. (JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrey v. Marion County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County School Board
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yancey
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Haldin
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Morris
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCollum
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Don Raymond
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Greene
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Crawford
Represented By: Usher L. Brown
Represented By: Vivian Cocotas
Represented By: Amy J. Pitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?