Lamkin v. National Steak Processors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Margaret Lamkin
Defendant: National Steak Processors, Inc.
Third_party_defendant: JBS USA Holdings, Inc. and JBS USA LLC
Movant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012mc00003
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 1 , 3 and 5 Ruby Tuesday's motions to quash subpoenas and overruling Ruby Tuesday's objections to the same subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/18/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing JBS USA Holdings, Inc. and JBS USA LLC to file their response to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.'s objection and motion to quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/23/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing defendant, National Steak Processors, Inc. to respond to non-party, Ruby Tuesday, Inc.'s objection and motion to quash subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/20/2012. (Smith, Thomas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamkin v. National Steak Processors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: JBS USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B. Toeniskoetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: JBS USA LLC
Represented By: Steven B. Toeniskoetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steak Processors, Inc.
Represented By: Cole Dunnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?