PNC Bank, N.A. v. Commercial Structures, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Commercial Structures, Inc., Sandra L. Register and David L. Register
Case Number: 5:2013cv00105
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ocala Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Referring Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 PNC Bank's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/6/2016. (AR)
June 17, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the production of documents. Within ten (10) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a copy of the First Request for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/17/2016. (CAB)
June 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel production of documents. On or before June 15, 2016, PNC Bank, N.A. and the Judgment Debtors shall file a memorandum, limited to 7 pages with citation to legal authority as described in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/1/2016. (CAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Commercial Structures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: John M. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Structures, Inc.
Represented By: Jose H. Cortes, Jr.
Represented By: Lynette Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L. Register
Represented By: Jose H. Cortes, Jr.
Represented By: Lynette Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Register
Represented By: Jose H. Cortes, Jr.
Represented By: Lynette Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?